+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 150 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB923ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB923H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106687D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20106687D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101131D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2020: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
February 18, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jennifer Carroll Foy
Type:
Primary Sponsor