+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB922ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
- Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18104708D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB922E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104708D