+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
- Incorporates HB816 (Hope)
- Committee substitute printed 20107649D-H1
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102658D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jennifer Carroll Foy
Type:
Primary Sponsor