+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 543 (effective 4/5/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB921ER)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (89-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (18-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to A., C. & N. R. sub-committee: 3
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.01/09/02 022169788
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2002: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (89-Y 10-N)
January 30, 2002: Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (18-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor