+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB920ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 22103904D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB920E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103904D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2022: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2022: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor