+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
- Enacted, Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB919ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
- Governor's substitute printed 18108369D-H1
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB919ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 18107784D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107784D-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB919S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107784D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18101739D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB919E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101739D