+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB917ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 859 (effective-see bill)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB917ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989695204-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989695204-H1
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989695204-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983311204
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor