+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB916ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 987061196-EH1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/ amds. 987061196-EH1
- Amendments by Ms. Darner agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 987061196-H1
- Read second time
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 987061196-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 988523196
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor