+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0572)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 572 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB916ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (76-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 21-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 13-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 19-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB916H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106657D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103908D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 21-N)
March 2, 2020: Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 13-N 1-A)
February 28, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N 1-A)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 4-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
January 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark D. Sickles
Type:
Primary Sponsor