+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 496 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB914ER)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 003394652-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 003394652-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 003394652-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 3
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 003328652
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2000: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor