+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1995 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD1570180 (HB910E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (18-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor