+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 460 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB910ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB910H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105127D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105127D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102860D
+ − Votes (9)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2016: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor