+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB908ER)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Sen. Ruff agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 041353200
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor