+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
On April 5, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB907ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 18-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (74-Y 18-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 11-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 964433340-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964433340-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 964433340-H1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (20-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 963286817
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 18-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
February 26, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (13-Y 2-N)
February 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
February 1, 1996: Reported from General Laws with sub. (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor