+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
On March 22, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB905ER)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 29, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 028031916-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 028031916-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 028031916-H1
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024187916
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2002: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
January 22, 2002: Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor