+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0440)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 440 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/16
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB903ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB903H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104769D-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16104769D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16104017D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor