+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 505 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB901ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB901H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105386D-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105386D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101048D
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor