+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1995 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed LD7915368 (HB900E)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from M. & P. with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: Reported from M. & P. with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor