+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 53-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (43-Y 53-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100974D
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2020: VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 53-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N)
January 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark L. Cole
Type:
Primary Sponsor