+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
- Enacted, Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/16)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB90ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB90ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment by Delegate Taylor agreed to
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB90EH1
- Printed as engrossed 16104825D-EH1
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB90H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104825D-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Incorporates HB119
- Committee substitute printed 16104825D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100115D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 20, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
April 20, 2016: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor