+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 838 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendations # 1,2,5,7,10 (19-Y 20-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (39-Y 55-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 4 and 6 (39-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 55-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 3, 8 and 9 (41-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 31-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2, 5, 7 and 10 (65-Y 31-N)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB9ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (65-Y 32-N)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: Martin, Obenshain, McWaters
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delegates: Cole, Cosgrove, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 4-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 12105584D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- Read third time
- Chair votes Yes
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB9S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Chair votes Yes
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105584D-S1 (19-Y 19-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105584D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (66-Y 28-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute (66-Y 28-N) HB9H1
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (70-Y 21-N)
- Pending question ordered (70-Y 21-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104815D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104815D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On December 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100452D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (19)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 31-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 55-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (39-Y 55-N)
March 9, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
March 8, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N)
March 2, 2012: Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 4-N)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
February 27, 2012: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
February 27, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N)
February 27, 2012: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2012: Committee substitute agreed to 12105584D-S1 (19-Y 19-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
February 1, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
January 31, 2012: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (70-Y 21-N)
January 31, 2012: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (66-Y 28-N)
January 27, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
January 17, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor