+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 30, 1994 in the House:
- For current comm. action change inquiry to 1995 Session
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Continued to 1995 in C. C. T.
- Rereferred to Counties, Cities and Towns
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amemdment (16-Y 4-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed