+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in General Laws (8-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 15-N)
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected
- Engrossed by House (88-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (88-Y 11-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 964144208