+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
On April 2, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB899ER)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006950620-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 006950620-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 006950620-H1
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 009017620