+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 214 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB897ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101042D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor