+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (78)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1218)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Enacted, Chapter 1218 (effective 7/1/20)
- VOTE: (64-Y 30-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (64-Y 30-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB896ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB896ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (59-Y 35-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 35-N)
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House requested second conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report rejected by House (40-Y 56-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 56-N)
- First Conference substitute printed 20109592D-H3
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (33-Y 5-N)
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: McPike, Mason, Pillion
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Second conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Sickles, Simon, Morefield
- Second Conference substitute printed 20109891D-H4
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: McPike, Mason, Pillion
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Sickles, Simon, Morefield
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108691D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB896S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 8-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 20108691D-S1 (0-Y 93-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20108691D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage #2 (69-Y 29-N)
- Passed House (69-Y 29-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: Passage (70-Y 27-N)
- Read third time and passed House (70-Y 27-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107404D-H2
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB896H2
- Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 20107059D-H1
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Incorporates HB911 (Simon)
- Committee substitute printed 20107404D-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 3-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20107059D-H1
- Incorporates HB911 (Simon)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103186D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (18)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (64-Y 30-N)
March 8, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
March 8, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 35-N)
March 7, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 56-N)
February 26, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 8-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N)
February 26, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 27-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage #2 (69-Y 29-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 3-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark D. Sickles
Type:
Primary Sponsor