+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB896ER)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 29-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (69-Y 29-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 064008712-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB896S1
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064008712-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1 (Orrock)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065124304
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (69-Y 29-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor