+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2003 in Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 028066838-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 028066838-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 028066838-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (19-Y 3-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 020160838
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2002: Continued to 2003 in Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
January 31, 2002: Reported from Tra. w/sub (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor