+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 28, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0325)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 325 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB891ER)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 961394358-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 961394358-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 961394358-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (21-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 961352358
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor