+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (59)
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0893)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 893 (effective 7/1/02)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (17-Y 78-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (17-Y 78-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB89ER)
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 028114986-H2
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 7-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 7-N)
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Senate sub. w/amds. rejected by House (41-Y 53-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 53-N)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on sub. w/amds. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senators: Watkins, Wagner, Puckett
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Welch, Wardrup, Miles
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Sen. Bolling agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 028102986-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. w/amds. 028102986-ES1
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 028102986-S1
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N 2-A)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 2-A)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 028033986-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 028033986-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 028033986-H1
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/01 021235986
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: REJECTED (17-Y 78-N)
March 8, 2002: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 7-N)
March 7, 2002: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2002: VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 53-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2002: Reported from Transportation w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 2-A)
January 22, 2002: Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor