+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 21, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
On April 7, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB889ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 003652916-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 003652916-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 003652916-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 003705560
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2000: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor