+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 178 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB885ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12103940D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB885E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103940D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor