+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor