+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (8-Y 8-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989757204-H1
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989757204-H1 (62-Y 32-N)
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (62-Y 35-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (15-Y 11-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989757204-H1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988823204
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 1998: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (8-Y 8-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (62-Y 35-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (15-Y 11-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor