+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 347 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB88ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
- Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101119D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2020: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Lee J. Carter
Type:
Primary Sponsor