+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 632 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB879ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Title replaced
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 981579466-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981579466-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981579466-H1
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 980836466
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from General Laws with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor