+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB879ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (93-Y 2-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD7384136 (HB879S1)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7372136 (HB879H1)
- Reported from Finance with sub. (20-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: Reported from Finance with sub. (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor