+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
- Enacted, Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/22)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB879ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 8-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 8-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 22108160D-H1
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB879ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N)
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 22-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100654D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 8-N)
March 8, 2022: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2022: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N)
January 31, 2022: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor