+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 32-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB878H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104110D-H1
- Read second time
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104110D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102846D
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2014: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N)
January 22, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 32-N)
January 16, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor