+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB876ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment #2 rejected
- Read third time
- Committee amendment #1 agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103364D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor