+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 54 (effective 7/1/04)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB876ER)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 044641440-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB876E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 044641440
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor