+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 100 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB875ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102431D