+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (18-Y 6-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 980828100
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (18-Y 6-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor