+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB871ER)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate sub. w/amd. agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 041187256-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Saslaw agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. w/amd. HB871S1
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (39-Y 1-N)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 041187256-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 040963256-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB871H1
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 040963256-H1
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 8
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047453256
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2004: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor