+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 10, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1125)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1125 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB870ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
- Conference substitute printed 20109141D-H1
- VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Boysko, Stanley
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Bourne, Hope, Miyares
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101454D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
March 7, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: Agree To (93-Y 1-N)
February 25, 2020: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
February 19, 2020: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jeffrey M. Bourne
Type:
Primary Sponsor