+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 474 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB87ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 1-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (19-Y 78-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (19-Y 78-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 1-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Thomas, Woodrum, Cantor
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senators: Miller, K.G., Trumbo, Howell
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (26-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims (16-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 987593468
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 1-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (19-Y 78-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (26-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Claims (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor