+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 119 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB869ER)
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB869S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064001712-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064001712-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #2 (Purkey)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065144256
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor