+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB865ER)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (58-Y 35-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 062751256-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute (58-Y 35-N) HB865H1
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062751256-H1
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Commerce and Labor sub-committee: Utilities/Employment (Byron)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062658256
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 44-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (58-Y 35-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor