+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2013 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104725D-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute (51-Y 45-N) HB864H1
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 45-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104725D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 8-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #4
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100956D
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2012: Continued to 2013 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N)
February 10, 2012: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 45-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 8-N)
January 26, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor