+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Rules (HB1362-Gilbert) (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16100705D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB861E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Ethics
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100705D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2016: Incorporated by Rules (HB1362-Gilbert) (13-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor